Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 4:18-cr-00205
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2018
Last checked: Friday Sep 07, 2018 2:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Justin Domonique Davis (3)
Represented By
John G. Gromowsky
The Gromowsky Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Torrence Demond Key (2)
Represented By
Sarah Grace Hess
Sandage Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joe Lee Nichols (1)
Represented By
Robert Glen Kuchar
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Kcmo
contact info
FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Anthony NMN Payne, Jr. (5)
Represented By
Joseph Vanover
Gunn, Shank & Stover, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Charles Stephon Porter (4)
Represented By
Arimeta Renae Dupree
A Dupree & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Bruce A. Rhoades
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info

GPO Jan 25 2022
MEMORANDUM OF MATTERS DISCUSSED AND ACTION TAKEN AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE as to Justin Domonique Davis. Signed on January 25, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts.(Clinton, Erica)
GPO May 18 2022
MEMORANDUM OF MATTERS DISCUSSED AND ACTION TAKEN AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE as to Justin Domonique Davis. Signed on May 18, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts.(Clinton, Erica)
GPO May 24 2022
ORDER granting 166 motion to sever counts as to Justin Domonique Davis (3). Signed on 5/24/2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Bliss, Sue)
GPO May 24 2022
ORDER granting 166 motion to sever counts as to Justin Domonique Davis (3). Signed on 5/24/2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Bliss, Sue)
GPO Jun 08 2022
ORDER (1) denying 169 Motion to Dismiss Indictment as to Justin Domonique Davis; and (2) adopting 175 Report and Recommendations as to Justin Domonique Davis. Signed on 6/8/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Casey, Susan)
GPO Aug 05 2022
ORDER denying 246 Motion to Sever as to Justin Domonique Davis (3). Signed on 8/5/2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Bliss, Sue) Modified on 8/5/2022 (Chorny, Traci). **A copy of this order will be sent via first-class US Mail to Justin Domonique Davis, 33385-045, Leavenworth - US Penitentiary, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 1000, Leavenworth, KS 66048.** The NEF will be regenerated.
GPO Aug 12 2022
ORDER denying 258 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Justin Domonique Davis. Signed on 8/12/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark.(Skelton, Sara) Modified on 8/12/2022 to reflect a copy of the order mailed to Justin Davis 33385045 USP Leavenworth PO Box 1000 Leavenworth, KS 66048 (Woods, Gloria).

Docket last updated: 09/07/2018 3:18 AM CDT
Thursday, July 19, 2018
ARREST of Joe Lee Nichols, Torrence Demond Key, Justin Domonique Davis, Charles Stephon Porter (Martin, Jan) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Joe Lee Nichols (1), Torrence Demond Key (2), Justin Domonique Davis (3), Charles Stephon Porter (4), Anthony NMN Payne, Jr. (5). (Chorny, Traci) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Joe Lee Nichols, Torrence Demond Key, Justin Domonique Davis, Charles Stephon Porter held on 7/19/2018. Defendants advised of the charges, penalties and rights. Defendants Joe Lee Nichols (01), Torrence Demond Key (02), Justin Domonique Davis (03) and Charles Stephon Porter (04) are temporarily detained pending detention hearing set for 7/24/18. Defendant Joe Lee Nichols (01) requests the Court to appoint counsel for him. The Federal Public Defenders Office will be appointed and will assist the defendant with filling out the Financial Affidavit (CJA 23 form) which will then be filed in ECF. Defendants Torrence Demond Key (02), Justin Domonique Davis (03) and Charles Stephon Porter (04) request the Court to appoint counsel. CJA Counsel will be appointed and will assist the defendants with filling out the Financial Affidavit (CJA 23 form) which will then be filed in ECF. ( Detention Hearing set for 7/24/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JTM) before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer., Preliminary Hearing set for 7/24/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JTM) before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer.) Time in court: 3:58 pm to 4:10 pm. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jan Martin, 816-512-5774. (Martin, Jan) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Joe Lee Nichols. Signed on 7/19/2018 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth.(Martin, Jan) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL UNDER CJA appointed in felony proceedings as to Torrence Demond Key. Sarah Grace Hess for Torrence Demond Key. Signed on 7/19/2018 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth.(Martin, Jan) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL UNDER CJA appointed in felony proceedings as to Justin Domonique Davis. John G. Gromowsky for Justin Domonique Davis. Signed on 7/19/2018 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth.(Martin, Jan) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL UNDER CJA appointed in felony proceedings as to Charles Stephon Porter. Arimeta Renae Dupree for Charles Stephon Porter. Signed on 7/19/2018 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth.(Martin, Jan) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 20, 2018
Attorney update in case as to Joe Lee Nichols. Attorney Robert Glen Kuchar for Joe Lee Nichols added. (Martin, Jan) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Justin Domonique Davis. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhoades, Bruce) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to continue detention hearing by USA as to Justin Domonique Davis. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhoades, Bruce) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Torrence Demond Key. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhoades, Bruce) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION to continue detention hearing by USA as to Torrence Demond Key. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhoades, Bruce) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Joe Lee Nichols. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhoades, Bruce) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION to continue detention hearing by USA as to Joe Lee Nichols. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhoades, Bruce) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Anthony NMN Payne, Jr.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhoades, Bruce) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION to continue detention hearing by USA as to Anthony NMN Payne, Jr.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhoades, Bruce) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Charles Stephon Porter. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhoades, Bruce) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION to continue detention hearing by USA as to Charles Stephon Porter. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhoades, Bruce) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Anthony NMN Payne, Jr. held on 7/20/2018.Defendant advised of the charges, penalties and rights. Motion for pretrial detention hearing and for continuance of hearing granted; defendant temporarily detained pending detention hearing set for 7/25/2018 at 11:00 am with Judge Maughmer. Defendant requests the Court to appoint counsel for him/her. An attorney will be appointed and will assist the defendant with filling out the Financial Affidavit (CJA 23 form) which will then be filed in ECF. ( Detention Hearing set for 7/25/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JTM) before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer., Preliminary Hearing set for 7/25/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JTM) before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer.) Time in court: 1:14 pm to 1:22 pm. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jan Martin, 816-512-5774. (Martin, Jan) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL UNDER CJA appointed in felony proceedings as to Anthony NMN Payne, Jr.. Joseph Vanover for Anthony NMN Payne, Jr.. Signed on 7/20/2018 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth.(Martin, Jan) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
24 24 ORDER OF DETENTION, CUSTODY DIRECTIVES AND ORDER AUTHORIZING TEMPORARY TRANSFER as to Justin Domonique Davis. Signed on 7/24/2018 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer.(Stepp, Jane) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER OF DETENTION, CUSTODY DIRECTIVES AND ORDER AUTHORIZING TEMPORARY TRANSFER as to Charles Stephon Porter. Signed on 7/24/2018 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer.(Stepp, Jane) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER OF DETENTION, CUSTODY DIRECTIVES AND ORDER AUTHORIZING TEMPORARY TRANSFER as to Joe Lee Nichols. Signed on 7/24/2018 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer.(Stepp, Jane) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
32 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer: DETENTION HEARING AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Joe Lee Nichols, Torrence Demond Key, Justin Domonique Davis, Charles Stephon Porter held on 7/24/2018. The parties agree to stipulate to the pretrial services reports as the direct testimony of the pretrial officers if called to testify. The parties further agree to stipulate to the affidavit in support of the complaint as the direct testimony of the case agent if called to testify. Government advises it will call Detective Loren Freeman to testify upon direct examination and offers a list of law enforcement contacts regarding the defendants as Exhibit One. Counsel for Defendant Porter objects to the use of Exhibit One for this hearing. Objection is overruled and Exhibit One is admitted. Direct examination of the case agent by government counsel. Cross examination by counsel for Defendant Davis (3). Redirect by government counsel. Re-cross examination by counsel for Defendant Davis (3). Cross examination by counsel for Defendant Key (2). No additional evidence or proffers presented. Arguments presented as to the issue of detention. The Court grants the government's motion(s) for pretrial detention as to Defendant Nichols, Davis and Porter based on the non-assurance of the safety of the community. Defendants Nichols, Davis and Porter remanded to custody. The Court denies the government's motion for pretrial detention as to Defendant Key. Defendant Key is eligible for release on a $50,000 with 10% ($5,000) cash deposit appearance bond. Conditions of release reviewed. Court finds probable cause and orders the matter referred to the Grand Jury for further investigation. Counsel appearing for USA: Bruce Rhoades. Counsel appearing for Defendant Nichols: Robert Kuchar. Counsel for Defendant Key: Sarah Hess. Counsel for Defendant Davis: John Gromowsky. Counsel for Defendant Porter: Arimeta Dupree. Pretrial/Probation Officer: Present. Time in court: 3:00pm to 3:30pm. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Kerry Martinez, 816-512-5759. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Martinez, Kerry) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
27 27 AFFIDAVIT of Financial Status of Torrence Demond Key. (Hess, Sarah) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
28 28 AFFIDAVIT of Financial Status of Anthony NMN Payne, Jr. (Vanover, Joseph) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
30 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer: DETENTION HEARING AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Anthony NMN Payne, Jr held on 7/25/2018. Government proffers a stipulation to the affidavit in support of the complaint as the direct testimony of the case agent if called to testify and the government advises they do intend to call the case agent to testify upon direct examination for purposes of the detention hearing.. No objection by defense counsel to the proffered stipulation regarding the affidavit. Government further proffers a stipulation to the pretrial services report as the direct testimony of the pretrial officer if called to testify. No objection by defense counsel to the proffered stipulation regarding the pretrial services report. Government calls Detective Loren Freeman to testify upon direct examination. Defense counsel does not request cross examination. No additional testimony or evidence is presented. Defendant makes proffer regarding potential employment with his father, who is present in the courtroom. Based on the record, the Court finds probable cause and orders the matter be referred to the Grand Jury for further investigation. With regard to the government's motion for pretrial detention, the Court finds that there are no conditions that could be set to assure the safety of the community. The government's motion for pretrial detention is granted and the defendant is remanded to custody. Counsel appearing for USA: Bruce Rhoades. Counsel appearing for Defendant: Joseph Vanover. Pretrial/Probation Officer: Tara Westerhof. Time in court: 11:00am to 11:30am. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Kerry Martinez, 816-512-5759. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Martinez, Kerry) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
29 29 MOTION to modify conditions of release by Torrence Demond Key. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hess, Sarah) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 03, 2018
31 31 ORDER OF DETENTION, CUSTODY DIRECTIVES AND ORDER AUTHORIZING TEMPORARY TRANSFER as to Anthony NMN Payne, Jr. Signed on 8/3/2018 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer.(Stepp, Jane) [4:18-mj-00098-MJW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
33 33 INDICTMENT as to Joe Lee Nichols (1) count(s) 1-10, 11-20, 21, Torrence Demond Key (2) count(s) 6-7, 10, 16-17, 20, Justin Domonique Davis (3) count(s) 1-5, 8-10, 11-15, 18-20, 21, 22, 23, Charles Stephon Porter (4) count(s) 1-3, 10, 11-13, 20, 21, Anthony NMN Payne, Jr (5) count(s) 6-7, 10, 16-17, 20, 21. (Crocker, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet Nichols,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet Key,
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet Davis,
Att: 4 Criminal Cover Sheet Porter,
Att: 5 Criminal Cover Sheet Payne