Hopkins v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46044 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Arizona, 2:18-cv-02646 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:35 PM EST |
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
F Kirk Hopkins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:48 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15867385 filed by F Kirk Hopkins. (O'Hara, Sean)(MFR) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15867385. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-02646 PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2018.] | |
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of Ohio via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2018.] | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-52) Transferring Case to the Northern District of Ohio Re MDL-2804. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2018.] | |
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 2:18-cv-02646. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |