META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. BMGM Co., L.L.C. d/b/a Honeycomb Kidz
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08010 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
BMGM Co., L.L.C. d/b/a Honeycomb Kidz
1407 Broadway Suite 803
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 07/16 9:10 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. BMGM Co., L.L.C. d/b/a Honeycomb Kidz CASE DISMISSED on 7/15/19 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Mon 07/15 2:33 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case |
|
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/15 1:12 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and BMGM Co., L..L.C. d/b/a Honeycomb Kidz Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 10:54 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 12/04 5:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Aaron F. Smeall on behalf of BMGM Co., L.L.C. d/b/a Honeycomb Kidz. (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 12/04 5:13 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant BMGM Co., L.L.C. d/b/a Honeycomb Kidz (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 9:39 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 09/14 3:10 PM
Summons Service Executed on BMGM Co., L.L.C. d/b/a Honeycomb Kidz 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Sunday, September 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sun 09/09 6:57 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08010 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7651589, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/07 12:26 PM
Summons Issued on BMGM Co., L.L.C. d/b/a Honeycomb Kidz Date Issued 9/7/2018, Answer Due 10/7/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/07 12:15 PM
Adversary case 18-08010 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against BMGM Co., L.L.C. d/b/a Honeycomb Kidz. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Jason M. Bergeron, Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |