META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Colortek, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08012 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Colortek, Inc.
1280 Research Blvd.
Saint Louis, MO 63132 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Mon 04/29 12:06 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation at filing #8 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/29 9:08 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Colortek, Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Webb, A.J.) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/29 1:11 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Colortek, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 4/29/19 . (nmw) |
||
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/18 3:31 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Colortek, Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation to Enter into Mediation and Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Webb, A.J.) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 10:54 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 12/04 5:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sarah J Applegate on behalf of Colortek, Inc.. (Applegate, Sarah) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 09/14 3:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on Colortek, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Sunday, September 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sun 09/09 6:57 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08012 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7651589, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/07 12:53 PM
Summons Issued on Colortek, Inc. Date Issued 9/7/2018, Answer Due 10/7/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/07 12:45 PM
Adversary case 18-08012 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Colortek, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |