Member Case
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-43168

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:18-bk-43561
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Specfac Group LLC
75001 IH-20
Gordon, TX 76453
Represented By
Gerrit M. Pronske
Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
37 37 misc Withdrawal Wed 04/26 2:42 PM
Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer Related [+]. (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to dismiss case
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
36 36 court Hearing held Thu 10/13 2:45 PM
Hearing held on 10/12/2022. Related [+] ***CONTINUED TO DATE TBD*** (Almaraz, Jeanette)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Monday, October 10, 2022
35 35 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Mon 10/10 7:14 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor MAR Living Trust Related [+]. (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to dismiss case
34 34 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Mon 10/10 4:46 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer Related [+]. (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to dismiss case
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
Att: 13 Exhibit 13
Att: 14 Exhibit 14
Att: 15 Exhibit 15
Att: 16 Exhibit 16
Att: 17 Exhibit 17
Att: 18 Exhibit 18
33 33 answer Objection Mon 10/10 2:14 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor MAR Living Trust. (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to dismiss case filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer
Monday, September 19, 2022
32 32 misc Certificate of service Mon 09/19 2:08 PM
Certificate of service re: Motion to Dismiss and Notice of Hearing filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer Related [+]. (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to dismiss case ,31 Notice of hearing
31 31 notice Notice of hearing Mon 09/19 2:05 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 10/12/2022 at 01:30 PM Ft. Worth, Judge Morris Ctrm. for30 , (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
30 30 motion Dismiss case Mon 09/19 2:03 PM
Motion to dismiss case Filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 15, 2018
29 29 order Joint administration Thu 11/15 3:50 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 4:18-bk-43168 with member case 4:2018-bk-43561-rfn Related [+]. An order has been entered in this case directing joint administration of this case solely for procedural purposes with the Chapter 11 bankruptcy case ofCM Resort, LLC, Case No. 18-43168 rfn11. The CM Resort, LLC docketshould be consulted on all matters affecting this case. Entered on 11/15/2018. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-] 20
28 28 order Employ Thu 11/15 3:47 PM
Order granting application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. for Specfac Group LLC as Attorney Related [+] Entered on 11/15/2018. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, November 02, 2018
court Meeting of creditors held Fri 11/02 1:58 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 11/2/2018 Related [+] (Schmidt, Erin)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
court Hearing held Wed 10/31 2:47 PM
Hearing held on 10/31/2018. Related [+] ***GRANTED*** (Levario, Tandi)
Related: [-] 17 Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Pronske # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Creditor Matrix)
court Hearing held Wed 10/31 2:48 PM
Hearing held on 10/31/2018. Related [+] ***GRANTED*** (Levario, Tandi)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for joint administration of cases 18-43168 rfn11; 18-43290 mxm11; 18-43294 mxm11; 18-43292 rfn11; 18-43562 mxm11; 18-43563 rfn11; 18-43565 mxm11; 18-43566 mxm11; 18-43567 rfn11 Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service Lists)
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
27 27 motion Appoint trustee Tue 10/30 4:47 PM
Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
26 26 answer Objection Mon 10/29 4:54 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for joint administration of cases 18-43168 rfn11; 18-43290 mxm11; 18-43294 mxm11; 18-43292 rfn11; 18-43562 mxm11; 18-43563 rfn11; 18-43565 mxm11; 18-43566 mxm11; 18-43567 rfn11 filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC
Friday, October 19, 2018
25 25 answer Objection Fri 10/19 3:59 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-] 17 Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC
24 24 answer Objection Fri 10/19 12:41 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-] 17 Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC
Friday, October 12, 2018
23 23 misc Statement of financial affairs Fri 10/12 6:26 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC Related [+]. (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
22 22 36 pgs misc Schedules Fri 10/12 6:26 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC Related [+]. (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
21 21 notice Notice of hearing Tue 10/09 3:45 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 10/31/2018 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm. for20 and for17 , (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-] 17 Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Pronske # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Creditor Matrix),20 Motion for joint administration of cases 18-43168 rfn11; 18-43290 mxm11; 18-43294 mxm11; 18-43292 rfn11; 18-43562 mxm11; 18-43563 rfn11; 18-43565 mxm11; 18-43566 mxm11; 18-43567 rfn11 Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service Lists)
Att: 1 Service List
Thursday, October 04, 2018
20 20 motion Joint administration Thu 10/04 11:50 AM
Motion for joint administration of cases 18-43168 rfn11; 18-43290 mxm11; 18-43294 mxm11; 18-43292 rfn11; 18-43562 mxm11; 18-43563 rfn11; 18-43565 mxm11; 18-43566 mxm11; 18-43567 rfn11 Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service Lists
Thursday, September 27, 2018
19 19 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 09/27 2:49 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Randal Gilbert Mathis filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Mathis, Randal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
18 18 order Extend/Shorten time Tue 09/25 12:18 PM
Order granting15 Motion to extend time. Related [+] Schedule A/B due 10/12/2018 for2 , Schedule D due 10/12/2018 for2 , Schedule E/F due 10/12/2018 for2 , Schedule G due 10/12/2018 for2 , Schedule H due 10/12/2018 for2 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/12/2018 for2 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 10/12/2018 for2 , Entered on 9/25/2018. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-] related document(s)2 Notice of deficiency
17 17 motion Employ Tue 09/25 10:48 AM
Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Pronske
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Creditor Matrix
Friday, September 21, 2018
16 16 misc Certificate of service Fri 09/21 3:02 PM
Certificate of service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix
15 15 motion Extend/Shorten time Fri 09/21 3:00 PM
Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Related [+] Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Creditor Matrix
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
14 14 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 09/18 4:05 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Dennis Oliver Olson filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 16, 2018
13 13 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sun 09/16 11:34 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/16/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 15, 2018
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sat 09/15 11:36 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/15/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/2/2018 at 09:30 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 1/31/2019. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 10/12/2018.
Thursday, September 13, 2018
10 10 misc 20 Largest unsecured creditors Thu 09/13 4:15 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
9 9 misc Matrix Thu 09/13 4:15 PM
Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor Specfac Group LLC Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
8 8 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 09/13 10:26 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Eboney D. Cobb filed by Palo Pinto County, Gordon ISD. (Cobb, Eboney)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 12, 2018
7 7 court BNC certificate of mailing Wed 09/12 11:31 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 9/21/2018. Schedule D due 9/21/2018. Schedule E/F due 9/21/2018. Schedule G due 9/21/2018. Schedule H due 9/21/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 9/21/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/21/2018. Creditor matrix due 9/12/2018. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 9/10/2018.
6 6 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Wed 09/12 12:57 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/2/2018 at 09:30 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 1/31/2019. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 10/12/2018. (Neary, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
5 5 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 09/11 11:10 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting 20 Largest Creditors from attorney for debtor. Responses due by 9/14/2018. (Banks, Courtney)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice of deficiency Tue 09/11 10:36 AM
Notice of deficiency. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 9/10/2018. Cash Flow Statement due 9/14/2018. Chapter 11 Small Business Balance Sheet due 9/14/2018. Chapter 11 Small Business Statement of Operations due 9/14/2018. (Banks, Courtney)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 09/11 10:18 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting 20 Largest Creditors from attorney for debtor. Related [+] Responses due by 9/14/2018. (Banks, Courtney)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 9/21/2018. Schedule D due 9/21/2018. Schedule E/F due 9/21/2018. Schedule G due 9/21/2018. Schedule H due 9/21/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 9/21/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/21/2018. Creditor matrix due 9/12/2018. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 9/10/2018.
Monday, September 10, 2018
2 2 court Notice of deficiency Mon 09/10 9:09 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 9/21/2018. Schedule D due 9/21/2018. Schedule E/F due 9/21/2018. Schedule G due 9/21/2018. Schedule H due 9/21/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 9/21/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/21/2018. Creditor matrix due 9/12/2018. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 9/10/2018. (Cumby, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 07, 2018
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Fri 09/07 5:51 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Specfac Group LLC (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 09/07 6:22 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 18-43561 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 25626067, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1