Diamond v. Weidner Property Management, LLC
Alaska District Court | |
Judge: | Sharon L Gleason |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-00012 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 07, 2014 3:50 AM AKST |
Defendant
Weidner Property Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Diamond
2732 Trailside Lp
Anchorage, AK 99507 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Francisco Blanco
Terminated: 02/10/2014
|
|
Defendant
Weidner Apartment Homes, Inc.
Terminated: 02/10/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM AKDT |
Wednesday, May 28, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 ORDER: of DISMISSAL22 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 05/28/2014. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF) | |
Friday, May 23, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Weidner Property Management, LLC.(Walker, Stacy) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice | ||
Monday, April 28, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 MINTUE ORDER : Appropriate closing papers or status report due within 30 days from the date of this order; October 16, 2014 Final Pretrial Conference and October 29, 2014 Trial by Jury are VACATED. (See order for full details). cc: JC (NKD, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/28/2014 to add distribution (NKD, COURT STAFF). | |
Tuesday, April 22, 2014 | ||
ENTERED FOR STATISTICAL CREDIT ONLY: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith: Settlement Conference held on 4/22/2014. This proceeding was not recorded. (CLW, COURT STAFF) | ||
Monday, April 21, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 AFFIDAVIT of Good Faith Certificate re18 MOTION to Compel Deposition Responses and Responses to Discovery Requests by Weidner Property Management, LLC. (Walker, Stacy) | |
18 | 18 MOTION to Compel Deposition Responses and Responses to Discovery Requests by Weidner Property Management, LLC.(Walker, Stacy) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Wednesday, April 16, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER/NOTICE re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Weidner Property Management, LLC. Responses due by May 12, 2014. (BJK, COURT STAFF) | |
Tuesday, April 15, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Weidner Property Management, LLC.(Walker, Stacy) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order Granting Defendants MSJ | ||
Monday, March 24, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 ORDER re Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 3/24/2014. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) | |
Tuesday, March 18, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER: re Settlement Conference13 , the matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Smith for settlment conference. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/18/2014. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF) | |
Thursday, March 13, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION/ NOTICE To Court Regarding Judicial Settlement Conference and Request for Same by Weidner Property Management, LLC(Walker, Stacy) Modified on 3/14/2014 to change to unopposed motion.(BJK, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Setting Settlment Conference | ||
Friday, March 07, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 PRETRIAL ORDER-SCHEDULING & PLANNING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for October 16, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. and 3 day Jury Trial set for October 29, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. Exhibit List due by 10/8/2014. Expert Witness List due by 10/8/2014. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/07/2014. cc: CAl and JC(AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF) | |
Thursday, March 06, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sharon L. Gleason: Status Conference held on 3/6/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2014 11:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. Jury Trial set for 10/29/2014 09:00 AM before Sharon L. Gleason. Court ordered Ms. Walker to file Joint Notice re Settlement Conference on or before March 13, 2014. (CME, COURT STAFF) | |
Thursday, February 27, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Weidner Property Management, LLC re8 Notice (Other)(Walker, Stacy) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Friday, February 21, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: re Scheduling Order7 , this order is no different than the scheduling order at Docket 7, except that the caption has been amended to reflect that Fracisco Blanco is not a Defendant.(AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF) | |
Wednesday, February 19, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE Opposition to Notice of Removal to Federal Court by Dan Diamond re1 Notice of Removal, (PXS, COURT STAFF) | |
Tuesday, February 18, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling Conference - Status Conference scheduled for March 6, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 02/18/2014. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF) | |
Monday, February 10, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Weidner Apartment Homes, Inc.(Walker, Stacy) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons and Opening Docs, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit EOA and Jury Demand, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Deficient Filing, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Motion to Accept Service, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Notice of Deficiency, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Answer, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Initial Pretrial Order, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Joint Notice of Trial Dates, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Order, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit RPO, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Motion for Extension of Time, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Order granting Extension of Time, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Notice of Dismissal, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Motion for Expedited Consideration, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Notice to Court re Expedited Consideration, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Order Granting Def Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Def Mtn to Amend Caption and file Amended Answer, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Order Granting Mtn to Amend Caption and file Amended Answer, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit Amended Answer, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit Order of Dismissal | ||
Thursday, January 30, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Weidner Apartment Homes, Inc. (Walker, Stacy) | |
Friday, January 24, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (CME, COURT STAFF) | |
Wednesday, January 22, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Weidner Apartment Homes, Inc. from Superior Court for the State of Alaska Third Judicial District At Anchorage, case number 3AN 13-07400CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--1687689)(Walker, Stacy) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint | ||
2 | 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Walker, Stacy) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Weidner Apartment Homes, Inc. from Superior Court in the State of Alaska Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN 13-07400CI. ( Filing fee $ 400), filed by Weidner Apartment Homes, Inc..(Walker, Stacy) Modified on 1/22/2014 to indicate error. See 1/22/14 Docket Annotation (NKD, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint | ||
Docket Annotation re1 Notice of Removal: ERROR: The parties are advised that the incorrect event was inadvertently used and the filing fee was not able to be paid using pay.gov. CORRECTION: Attorney Walker to refile the Notice of Removal and attached state court document(s) using the event "Notice of Removal" located in the Notices menu and pay the filing fee during the docketing process. (NKD, COURT STAFF) |