South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Referred: Kaymani D West
Case #: 5:18-cv-02460
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2018
Terminated:Jan 08, 2019

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
28 28 misc Document Mailed Tue 01/08 9:17 AM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:26 Order on Motion to Dismiss w/NEF,27 Judgment w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail to William Raymond Taylor, #23219-016, FCI Edgefield, PO Box 725, Edgefield, SC 29824. (prou, )
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Judgment Tue 01/08 9:14 AM
JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed without prejudice. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 01/07 12:52 PM
ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. This case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/7/2019.(eric, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
25 25 motion Dismiss Thu 12/20 1:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by William Raymond Taylor. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, November 29, 2018
24 24 service Certified Mail Receipt Thu 11/29 3:09 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re14 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, served on Attorney General of the US on 11/26/2018. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
23 23 misc Document Mailed Tue 11/13 10:05 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail to William Raymond Taylor, #23219-016, FCI Edgefield, PO Box 725, Edgefield, SC 29824. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 09, 2018
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 11/09 11:01 AM
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William Raymond Taylor. Objections to Report and Recommendation due by 12/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/9/2018.(eric, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 11/08 12:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William Raymond Taylor by William Raymond Taylor. Response to Motion due by 11/26/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, October 29, 2018
18 18 misc Document Mailed Mon 10/29 4:50 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:14 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, placed in U.S. Mail via certified mail (article number 7014 0150 0000 5030 8190) to Attorney General of the US, Dept. Of Justice, Room B-103, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Washington, DC 20530-001. (prou, )
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Document Mailed Mon 10/29 4:47 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, 15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Copies,14 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer w/NEF, and a copy request form, placed in U.S. Mail to William Raymond Taylor, #23219-016, FCI Edgefield, PO Box 725, Edgefield, SC 29824. (prou, )
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 10/29 4:35 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus in this case be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/29/2018. (prou, )
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Copies Mon 10/29 4:27 PM
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; denying 12 Motion for Copies per 14 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/29/2018.(prou, )
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer Mon 10/29 4:24 PM
ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/29/2018.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
12 12 motion Copies Thu 10/11 12:41 PM
MOTION for Copies at no expense by William Raymond Taylor. Response to Motion due by 10/25/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/10 10:13 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by William Raymond Taylor. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
Att: 1 Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
8 8 misc Document Mailed Tue 09/25 2:26 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:7 Proper Form Order w/NEF and Form AO 240, placed in U.S. Mail to William Raymond Taylor, #23219-016, FCI Edgefield, PO Box 725, Edgefield, SC 29824. (prou, )
Related: [-]
7 7 order Proper Form Order Tue 09/25 2:23 PM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 10/16/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 9/25/2018. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
2 2 misc True Division for Trial Fri 09/07 3:27 PM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenwood. (prou, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 or 2241 Fri 09/07 3:26 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William Raymond Taylor.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Indictment,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Indictment,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Memorandum of Plea Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Supporting Documents,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Plea Agreement,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Position of the United States With Respect To Sentencing Factors,
Att: 8 Envelope