California Central District Court
Case #: 2:18-mj-02073
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2018
Terminated:Aug 09, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Sep 08, 2018 12:21 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jacqueline Nicole Muller (1)
Terminated: 08/09/2018
Represented By
Pedro V Castillo
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/08/2018 12:47 AM PDT
Thursday, August 09, 2018
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller, originating in the District of Columbia. Defendant charged in violation of: 22:3008. Signed by agent J. Bravo, U.S. Marshals Service, DEO. (jp) (jp).
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller; defendant Year of Birth: 1991; date of arrest: 8/9/2018. (jp)
Related: [-]
3 3 Defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller arrested on warrant issued by the USDC District of Columbia.. (jp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Document
4 4 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: Pedro V Castillo for Jacqueline Nicole Muller, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Government's Request for Detention is DENIED. Court orders bail set as: Jacqueline Nicole Muller (1) $200,000.00, AB WITH FOLLOWING CONDITIONS: (SEE ATTACHED BOND). Defendant executed Waiver of Rights. Court orders defendant held to answer to Superior Court, Washington D.C., 500 Indiana Ave NW, Courtroom C-10. Bond to Transfer. Defendant ordered to report on 8/20/2018. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Court Smart: Court Smart. (jp)
Related: [-]
5 5 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller. (Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002). (jp)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller. (jp)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER OF RIGHTS (OUT OF DISTRICT CASES) approved by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller. (jp)
Related: [-]
8 8 ADVISEMENT OF DEFENDANT'S STATUTORY AND CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller. (jp)
Related: [-]
9 9 REDACTED - AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $200,000.00 by surety: Cris Tina Muller. Filed by Defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller. (jp)
Related: [-]
10 10 UNREDACTED - AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $200,000.00 by surety: Cris Tina Muller. re: Redacted - Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)9 . (jp)
Related: [-]
11 11 DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller, declaring that I have never been issued any passport or other travel document by any country. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (jp)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs MEMORANDUM FOR RELEASE ORDER AUTHORIZATION filed by PSA Officer as to Defendant Jacqueline Nicole Muller. (jp)
Related: [-]