META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Kellwood Apparel, LLC d/b/a My Michelle
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08015 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Kellwood Apparel, LLC d/b/a My Michelle
600 Kellwood Parkway
Chesterfield, MO 63017 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 02/19 9:27 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary ProceedingFiled by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 02/19 10:07 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Kellwood Apparel, LLC d/b/a My Michelle CASE DISMISSED on 2/19/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 02/19 10:08 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Kellwood Apparel, LLC d/b/a My Michelle CASE DISMISSED on 2/19/19 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, February 18, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 02/18 8:02 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 9:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 09/14 3:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on Kellwood Apparel, LLC d/b/a My Michelle 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Sunday, September 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sun 09/09 6:57 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08015 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7651589, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/07 1:16 PM
Summons Issued on Kellwood Apparel, LLC d/b/a My Michelle Date Issued 9/7/2018, Answer Due 10/7/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/07 1:14 PM
Adversary case 18-08015 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Kellwood Apparel, LLC d/b/a My Michelle. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |