META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Sheralven Enterprises Ltd.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08017 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sheralven Enterprises Ltd.
2 Rodeo Drive
Edgewood, NY 11717 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Thu 05/23 7:38 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties at filing #8 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 05/23 8:12 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Sheralven Enterprises Ltd. CASE DISMISSED on 5/23/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/22 3:35 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Sheralven Enterprises Ltd. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 10:54 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/07 1:13 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Sheralven Enterprises Ltd. (Quinn, Douglas) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 7:21 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 09/14 3:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sheralven Enterprises Ltd. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Sunday, September 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sun 09/09 6:57 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08017 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7651589, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/07 1:39 PM
Summons Issued on Sheralven Enterprises Ltd. Date Issued 9/7/2018, Answer Due 10/7/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/07 1:29 PM
Adversary case 18-08017 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Sheralven Enterprises Ltd.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, Benjamin M. Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |