META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. High Life LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08022 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
High Life LLC
31 W. 34th Street 6th Floor
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 05/31 10:26 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 05/31 8:08 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 05/31 11:50 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. High Life LLC CASE DISMISSED ON 5/31/19 . (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Tue 05/07 12:08 PM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
13 | 13
order
Vacating Order
Tue 05/07 11:29 AM
Order Vacating Order . The order Granting Motion for Default Judgment at Fil. #6 and the Default Judgment at Fil. #7 are hereby vacated pursuant to the terms of the Stipulation at Fil. #10. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order Granting
Tue 05/07 11:25 AM
Order Approving . The stipulation is approved and binding on the parties. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
11 | 11
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Tue 05/07 10:23 AM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/02 10:05 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and High Life LLC Re: Stipulation to Vacate March 5, 2019 Default Judgment Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
utility
Reopen AP Case
Thu 05/02 1:06 PM
Adversary Case Reopened. . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
Entry
Wed 03/20 12:24 PM
US District Court case number is 8:19-mc-00088-UNA. . (nmw) |
|
8 | 8
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Wed 03/20 10:54 AM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/20 12:27 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered on 3/5/19 . (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Default Judgment
Tue 03/05 7:13 AM
Default Judgment . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant: (i) in the amount of $264,057.00, which amount includes filing fees of $350.00; and (ii) pursuant to sections 502(d) and (j) of the Bankruptcy Code, disallowing in full and expunging all claims held by or filed on behalf of the Defendant against any of the Debtors in the above-captioned cases, including the Claim. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
6 | 6
order
Default Judgment
Tue 03/05 7:12 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion for default judgment is granted. Separate default judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 11:27 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 9:10 AM
Summons Service Executed on High Life LLC 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/10 8:05 AM
Summons Issued on High Life LLC Date Issued 9/10/2018, Answer Due 10/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 7:39 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08022 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7651686, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Sunday, September 09, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 09/09 7:29 PM
Adversary case 18-08022 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against High Life LLC. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |