META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Suncraft Technologies, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08025 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Suncraft Technologies, Inc.
1301 Frontenac Rd.
Naperville, IL 60563 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 1:08 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 04/09 12:57 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 04/09 11:15 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 04/09 1:35 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Suncraft Technologies, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 4/9/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:02 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Mon 01/07 12:23 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Suncraft Technologies, Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation to Enter into Mediation and Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 12/04 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sarah J Applegate on behalf of Suncraft Technologies, Inc.. (Applegate, Sarah) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 9:34 AM
Summons Service Executed on Suncraft Technologies, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/10 8:09 AM
Summons Issued on Suncraft Technologies, Inc. Date Issued 9/10/2018, Answer Due 10/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 7:39 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08025 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7651686, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Sunday, September 09, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 09/09 8:12 PM
Adversary case 18-08025 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Suncraft Technologies, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |