META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Tinnovate LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08031 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 14, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Tinnovate LLC
1550 Valley Vista Drive Ste. 210
Diamond Bar, CA 91765 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/14 2:32 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/14 9:26 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Severini, Erin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 05/14 2:39 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Tinnovate LLC CASE DISMISSED on 5/14/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:32 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/03 7:52 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Tinnovate LLC Re: Joint Stipulation to Enter into Mediation and Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Severini, Erin) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 4:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on Tinnovate LLC 10/11/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Thu 10/11 1:14 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Tinnovate LLC Date Issued 10/11/2018, Answer Due 11/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 9:43 AM
Summons Service Executed on Tinnovate LLC 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/10 8:23 AM
Summons Issued on Tinnovate LLC Date Issued 9/10/2018, Answer Due 10/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 7:39 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08031 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7651686, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Sunday, September 09, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 09/09 9:10 PM
Adversary case 18-08031 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Tinnovate LLC. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Brian J. Koenig, Douglas L. Lutz, Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |