META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Desma Group, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08032 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Desma Group, Inc.
1395 East Cobb Dr. #72992
Marietta, GA 30007 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Wed 05/29 1:30 PM
Order to Dismiss Adversary Case . This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the terms of the Stipulation (Fil. #17). Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (drs) |
|
18 | 18
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Wed 05/29 1:26 PM
Order Regarding Stipulation |
|
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/29 9:50 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Desma Group, Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 05/29 1:31 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Desma Group, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 5/29/19 . (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/28 2:41 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Desma Group, Inc. Re: Vacating Default Judgment Stipulation to Vacate March 4, 2019 Default Judgment Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
court
Entry - Re: Withdrawal
Thu 05/02 2:30 PM
Court entry . No action will be taken by the court on the related Pleading due to the filing of the withdrawal. Any associated hearing and/or deadlines have been terminated. (Text Only) (dkk) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Withdrawal
Thu 05/02 11:29 AM
Withdrawal of Defendant's Motion to Reconsider and/or Set Aside Default Judgment Filed by Howard T. Duncan on behalf of Desma Group, Inc.. (Duncan, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extend Time
Thu 04/18 10:33 AM
Order Granting Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Reconsider and/or Set Aside Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC, on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (k/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion is granted. The deadline for the Plaintiff to respond to defendant's motion to reconsider and/or set aside default judgment is extended to May 3, 2019. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend Time
Wed 04/17 3:21 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time Unopposed Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Extend Time
Thu 04/04 5:01 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Reconsider and/or Set Aside Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion is Granted. The deadline for the Plaintiff to respond to defendant's motion to reconsider and/or set aside default judgment is extended to April 18, 2019. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time
Thu 04/04 4:04 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Reconsider
Thu 03/14 2:59 PM
Motion to Reconsider and Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment Filed by Defendant Desma Group, Inc. 9013 Objections due by 4/4/2019. (Duncan, Howard) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 03/14 1:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Howard T. Duncan on behalf of Desma Group, Inc.. (Duncan, Howard) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 1:56 PM
Default Judgment . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant: (i) in the amount of $205,234.00, which amount includes filing fees of $350.00; and (ii) pursuant to sections 502(d) and (j) of the Bankruptcy Code, disallowing in full and expunging all claims held by or filed on behalf of the Defendant against any of the Debtors in the above-captioned cases, including the Claim. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
6 | 6
order
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 1:55 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion for default judgment is granted. Separate default judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 03/01 9:32 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 9:40 AM
Summons Service Executed on Desma Group, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/10 8:24 AM
Summons Issued on Desma Group, Inc. Date Issued 9/10/2018, Answer Due 10/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 7:39 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08032 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7651686, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Sunday, September 09, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 09/09 9:25 PM
Adversary case 18-08032 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Desma Group, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Brian J. Koenig, Douglas L. Lutz, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |