META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Engie Insight Services, Inc. f/k/a Ecova, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08035 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Engie Insight Services, Inc. f/k/a Ecova, Inc.
1313 N Atlantic, Suite 5000
Spokane, WA 99201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/07 2:36 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/07 11:42 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 05/07 3:08 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Engie Insight Services, Inc. f/k/a Ecova, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 5/7/19 . (nmw) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certification Regarding Mediation
Fri 04/19 9:05 AM
Final Certification Regarding Mediation Mediator's Report Filed by Douglas L. Lutz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 10:54 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Thu 12/13 11:45 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Engie Insight Services, Inc. f/k/a Ecova, Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation to Enter into Mediation and Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 9:31 AM
Summons Service Executed on Engie Insight Services, Inc. f/k/a Ecova, Inc. 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 9:49 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:07 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Engie Insight Services, Inc. f/k/a Ecova, Inc. Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 2:26 PM
Summons Service Executed on Engie Insight Services, Inc. f/k/a Ecova, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08035 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/10 9:39 AM
Summons Issued on Engie Insight Services, Inc. f/k/a Ecova, Inc. Date Issued 9/10/2018, Answer Due 10/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 9:36 AM
Adversary case 18-08035 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Engie Insight Services, Inc. f/k/a Ecova, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |