META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Flyp Sportswear Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08036 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 21, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Flyp Sportswear Inc.
1384 Broadway, Suite 105
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Tue 05/21 2:04 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties at filing #12 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/21 11:42 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Flyp Sportswear Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 05/21 2:24 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Flyp Sportswear Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 5/21/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 10:54 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Sunday, December 09, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Sun 12/09 7:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Susan Warnock on behalf of Flyp Sportswear Inc.. (Warnock, Susan) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
District Court re: Order Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/07 7:57 AM
Text only order was entered in Nebraska U.S. District Court Case 8:18-mc-00094-UNA granting a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for attorney Susan C. Warnock (nmw) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
District Court re: Order Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/12 9:01 AM
Text only order was entered in Nebraska U.S. District Court Case 8:18-mc-00094-UNA granting a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jie Tan. (nmw) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 9:49 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on Flyp Sportswear Inc. 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 9:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:08 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Flyp Sportswear Inc. Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 10:11 AM
Summons Service Executed on Flyp Sportswear Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08036 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/10 11:33 AM
Summons Issued on Flyp Sportswear Inc. Date Issued 9/10/2018, Answer Due 10/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 11:22 AM
Adversary case 18-08036 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Flyp Sportswear Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |