META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. N & W Transfer, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08039 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 14, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
N & W Transfer, Inc.
2415 Industrial Rd.
Plattsmouth, NE 68048 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Dismissing Debtor(s)
Tue 05/14 2:48 PM
Order Dismissing . Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties (Fil. #10) this adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (drs) |
|
11 | 11
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Tue 05/14 2:46 PM
Order Approving |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/14 9:58 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and N & W Transfer, Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 05/14 2:52 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. N & W Transfer, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 5/14/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:02 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/19 3:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant N & W Transfer, Inc. (Niemeier, James) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 7:24 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 10:14 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on N & W Transfer, Inc. 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:10 PM
Alias Summons Issued on N & W Transfer, Inc. Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 2:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on N & W Transfer, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08039 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/10 12:14 PM
Summons Issued on N & W Transfer, Inc. Date Issued 9/10/2018, Answer Due 10/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 11:56 AM
Adversary case 18-08039 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against N & W Transfer, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |