META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. JRG Apparel Group Company Limited
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08040 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
JRG Apparel Group Company Limited
1407 Broadway, Suite 317
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 10/11 7:52 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 10/11 8:07 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. JRG Apparel Group Company Limited CASE DISMISSED on 10/11/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 10/11 8:07 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. JRG Apparel Group Company Limited CASE DISMISSED on 10/11/18 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/10 10:39 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:11 PM
Alias Summons Issued on JRG Apparel Group Company Limited Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) ENTERED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. Modified on 9/19/2018 (nmw) |
|
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:10 PM
Alias Summons Issued on JRG Apparel Group Company Limited Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
utility
Corrective Entry-Wrong Case
Wed 09/19 12:12 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: THE PLEADING IS FILED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. . (nmw) |
||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 2:43 PM
Summons Service Executed on JRG Apparel Group Company Limited 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08040 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/10 12:15 PM
Summons Issued on JRG Apparel Group Company Limited Date Issued 9/10/2018, Answer Due 10/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 12:10 PM
Adversary case 18-08040 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against JRG Apparel Group Company Limited. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Douglas L. Lutz, Erin P. Severini, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |