META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Quality King Distributors, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08041 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Quality King Distributors, Inc.
35 Sawgrass Drive
Bellport, NY 11713 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 01/24 10:39 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 01/24 12:13 PM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Quality King Fragrance, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 1/24/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 01/24 12:14 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Quality King Fragrance, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 1/24/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/23 4:13 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
Deficiency Notice
Thu 01/17 3:10 PM
Deficiency Notice. Deficiency must be cured by 1/31/19 . (nmw) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 01/17 2:19 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Webb, A.J.) INCORRECT DEFENDANT IS REFLECTED ON THE PDF. Modified on 1/17/2019 (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 11/20 2:22 PM
Alias Summons Service Executed on Quality King Fragrance, Inc. 11/13/2018 Pluries Summons Service Executed . (Lutz, Douglas) INCORRECT ATTORNEY LOGIN/PASSWORD WAS USED. DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO REFLECT CORRECT FILER, DOUGLAS LUTZ. Modified on 11/20/2018 (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Alias Summons Issued
Tue 11/13 12:30 PM
Second Pluries Summons Issued on Quality King Fragrance, Inc. Date Issued 11/13/2018, Answer Due 12/13/2018 . (nmw) |
|
9 | 9
utility
Corrective Entry
Tue 11/13 12:29 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: A NEW DEFENDANT WAS NOT BEING ADDED. DEFENDANT'S NAME IS BEING CORRECTED. A NEW SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED. . (nmw) |
|
8 | 8
court
Alias Summons Issued
Tue 11/13 8:34 AM
INCORRECT DEFENDANT WAS REFLECTED. DISREGARD THIS SUMMONS. Summons Issued on Quality King Fragrance, Inc. Date Issued 11/13/2018, Answer Due 12/13/2018 . (nmw) Modified on 11/13/2018 (nmw) |
|
Monday, November 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 11/12 2:58 PM
Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Douglas L. Lutz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Quality King Fragrance, Inc.. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 10:27 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on Quality King Distributors, Inc. 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:12 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Quality King Distributors, Inc. Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 2:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on Quality King Distributors, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08041 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/10 12:35 PM
Summons Issued on Quality King Distributors, Inc. Date Issued 9/10/2018, Answer Due 10/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 12:20 PM
Adversary case 18-08041 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Quality King Distributors, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Brian J. Koenig, Douglas L. Lutz, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |