Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jack Zouhary
Case #: 3:18-cv-02072
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2661 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2018
Terminated:Feb 20, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2019 5:20 AM EST
Defendant
Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.
c/o CT Corp. System, 1200 E. 9th St.
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Brian P. FitzGerald
Littler Mendelson - Cleveland
contact info
Amy Ryder Wentz
Littler Mendelson - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
William Francis
2400 State Blvd.
Maumee, OH 43537
Represented By
Katherine A. Pawlak
Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg
contact info
Francis J. Landry
Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
22 22 2 pgs order Stipulation & Order Wed 07/03 1:51 PM
Stipulation & Judgment Entry of Dismissal with Prejudice approving21 Proposed Stipulation and Judgment Entry of Dismissal With Prejudice. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/3/2019. (D,L)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs notice Stipulation Wed 07/03 1:04 PM
Proposed Stipulation and Judgment Entry of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by William Francis. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
20 20 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Minute Order _ Settlement Conference Fri 05/31 2:47 PM
ORDER . In-Person Conference held on 5/31/19. Court Reporter: Stacey Kiprotich. Settlement confirmed on the record. Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel19 is denied as moot. (1 hr) Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/31/19. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/31 9:00 AM
Motion by Francis J. Landry and Katherine A. Pawlak to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff William Francis. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
18 18 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Tue 05/07 9:17 AM
ORDER . At the request of counsel17 , Phone Status held on 5/6/19. Court sua sponte schedules a hearing to enforce a settlement agreement on 5/31/19 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. Plaintiff and his counsel shall appear in person; defense counsel may appear either in person or by phone. Failure of Plaintiff to appear may result in sanctions by this Court. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/7/19. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Mon 05/06 10:30 AM
NOTICE [non-document] of Phone Status re settlement set for 5/6/19 at 4:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
17 17 notice Status Report Fri 05/03 2:19 PM
Status Report of Plaintiff filed by William Francis. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/20 10:01 AM
Dismissal Order. Settlement Conference held on 2/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge James Knepp resulted in a settlement. Settled and dismissed without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs. Any subsequent Dismissal with prejudice filed within 30 days shall supersede this Order. This Court also retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/20/2019. (D,L)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Terminate Referral Tue 02/19 12:57 PM
Minutes of Settlement Conference [non-document] held on 2/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. Plaintiff appeared with attorneys Francis J. Landry and Katherine A. Pawlak; attorney Amy Ryder Wentz appeared for Defendant with representative Jeff Muszynski. Case settled. Dismissal entry to be filed within 30 days. Time: 3 hours. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Tue 01/29 1:26 PM
Order. [non-document] The Settlement Conference previously set for 1/31/2019 at 1:00 PM is VACATED and RESET for 2/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 318 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II. All other deadlines reflected in Order15 shall apply. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 1/29/2019. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 04, 2019
15 15 4 pgs order Order Fri 01/04 4:31 PM
Order. Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 318 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted by email to Knepp_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 1/28/2019. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 1/4/2019. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
14 14 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Thu 01/03 4:45 PM
ORDER . Phone Status held on 1/3/19. Settlement Conference/Mediation set for 1/31/19 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 318 before Magistrate Judge James Knepp. Lead counsel and parties shall appear in person (the Local Manager for Defendant Rite Aid will be present in person; general counsel for Defendant will be available by phone from Pennsylvania). Brief confidential statements due by 1/28/19. Counsel shall report to Judge Zouhary's Chambers immediately following the Conference to inform Court if case has settled, or to discuss remaining case schedule. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/3/19. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
13 13 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting Fri 12/21 10:37 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by William Francis. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 30, 2018
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/30 11:00 AM
Answer to1 Complaint filed by Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.. (Wentz, Amy)
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Fri 11/30 9:56 AM
Marginal Entry Order denying without prejudice2 Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. To be discussed at 1/3/2019 Case Management Conference. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/30/2018. (D,L)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 11/27 4:26 PM
NOTICE [non-document]. Due to a conflict on this Court's docket, the Case Management Conference set for 12/18/18 is vacated and reset for 1/3/19 at 10:00 AM (by phone) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. The Report of Parties due 3 days before the conference. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 26, 2018
10 10 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Fri 10/26 12:47 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE . CMC to be held on 12/18/18 at 10:00 AM at Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. If parties do not wish to discuss settlement at the CMC, then counsel may attend the CMC by phone. See Order9 for detail if parties believe settlement discussions could be productive and wish to convert the CMC into a Joint Settlement/Case Management Conference. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/26/18. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Fri 10/26 12:42 PM
ORDER . Initial Phone Status held on 10/25/18. Defendant's Answer due by 12/3/18. Court's Civil Case Management Procedures is filed along with this Order. Case Management Conference to be held on 12/18/18 at 10:00 AM at Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel shall promptly complete initial disclosures. A CMC Notice (with a form Report of Parties) will be filed along with this Order. If parties do not wish to discuss settlement at the CMC, then counsel may attend the CMC by phone. If the parties believe settlement discussions could be productive and wish to convert the CMC into a joint SC/CMC, (1) parties shall notify Court in advance, (2) Plaintiff shall make a settlement demand to Defendant, (3) Defendant shall respond to the demand before the SC/CMC, and (4) lead counsel and parties shall attend the SC/CMC in person. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/26/18. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pleading Civil Case Management Procedures
Thursday, October 25, 2018
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Thu 10/25 11:49 AM
NOTICE [non-document]. Due to a conflict on this Court's docket, the Initial Phone Status set for 10/25/18 will now be held at 3:00 PM (NOT 4:00 PM) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 22, 2018
8 8 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/22 8:40 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc. filed by Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.. (Wentz, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Wed 10/17 8:51 AM
NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 10/25/18 at 4:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed before the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/16 12:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.. (Wentz, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
oth_evt Notice of Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/11 8:11 PM
Notice by Clerk that Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (D,TM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/03 9:56 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.. Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc. (FitzGerald, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 10/03 9:52 AM
Attorney Appearance by Brian P. FitzGerald filed by on behalf of Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.. (FitzGerald, Brian)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 10/03 9:04 AM
Attorney Appearance by Amy Ryder Wentz filed by on behalf of Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.. (Wentz, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
3 3 notice Notice Tue 09/11 6:17 PM
Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by William Francis. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 09/11 8:59 AM
Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 09/11 9:03 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/10 8:49 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Application Form AO239) filed by Plaintiff William Francis. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/10 8:47 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc... Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by William Francis. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet