MSI Corporation v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46053 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Western, 2:18-cv-01109 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:35 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Plaintiff
MSI Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:23 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS PLC, ACTAVIS, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCKESSON CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4834673), filed by MSI CORPORATION. (jd) [Transferred from pawd on 9/10/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/23/18. (jhi) [Transferred from pawd on 9/10/2018.] | |
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of Ohio. (jd) [Transferred from pawd on 9/10/2018.] | |
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Western. Case number 2:18-cv-01109. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |