META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Samsung C&T America, Inc./Q4 Designs
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08045 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Samsung C&T America, Inc./Q4 Designs
105 Challenger Road
Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Mon 08/12 3:06 PM
Order to Dismiss Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation at filing #11 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Mon 08/12 1:15 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Samsung C&T America, Inc.\Q4 Designs Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 08/12 3:30 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Samsung C&T America, Inc./Q4 Designs CASE DISMISSED on 8/12/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:02 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/31 9:31 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Samsung C&T America, Inc./Q4 Designs (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/31 9:31 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Aaron F. Smeall on behalf of Samsung C&T America, Inc./Q4 Designs. (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 8:01 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 10:29 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on Samsung C&T America, Inc./Q4 Designs 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:14 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Samsung C&T America, Inc./Q4 Designs Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 3:00 PM
Summons Service Executed on Samsung C&T America, Inc./Q4 Designs 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08045 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/10 4:27 PM
Summons Issued on Samsung C&T America, Inc./Q4 Designs Date Issued 9/10/2018, Answer Due 10/10/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 4:13 PM
Adversary case 18-08045 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Samsung C&T America, Inc./Q4 Designs. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |