META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Turn on Products Inc. d/b/a Younique Clothing
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08050 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Turn on Products Inc. d/b/a Younique Clothing
263 W. 38th Street 8th Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 07/11 10:21 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Turn on Products Inc. d/b/a Younique Clothing CASE DISMISSED on 7/10/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Wed 07/10 4:05 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties at filing #9 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/10 10:50 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Turn on Products Inc. d/b/a Younique Clothing Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 10:54 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/12 12:52 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Turn on Products Inc. d/b/a Younique Clothing (Ashby, Thomas) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 7:17 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:17 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Turn on Products Inc. d/b/a Younique Clothing Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) ATTORNEY STATED THAT THIS CASE WAS SERVED PROPERLY SO NO LONGER REQUIRED AN ALIAS SUMMONS. DEADLINES HAVE BEEN CORRECTED. Modified on 9/19/2018 (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 3:19 PM
Summons Service Executed on Turn on Products Inc. d/b/a Younique Clothing 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/11 8:03 AM
Summons Issued on Turn on Products Inc. d/b/a Younique Clothing Date Issued 9/11/2018, Answer Due 10/11/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08050 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 6:13 PM
Adversary case 18-08050 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Turn on Products Inc. d/b/a Younique Clothing. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |