META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. V-Tech Indusries, L.P.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08063 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 15, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
V-Tech Indusries, L.P.
5534 Harvey Wilson Drive
Houston, TX 77020 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 10/15 11:24 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. V-Tech Industries, L.P. CASE DISMISSED on 10/12/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 10/15 11:25 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. V-Tech Industries, L.P. CASE DISMISSED on 10/12/18 . (nmw) |
||
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 10/12 3:06 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by PlaintiffMETA Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 10/12 1:52 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 11:02 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on V-Tech Industries, L.P. 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO CORRECT THE SPELLING OF DEFENDANTS NAME. Modified on 10/11/2018 (nmw) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:22 PM
Alias Summons Issued on V-Tech Indusries, L.P. Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/17 4:23 PM
Summons Service Executed on V-Tech Indusries, L.P. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/11 8:19 AM
Summons Issued on V-Tech Indusries, L.P. Date Issued 9/11/2018, Answer Due 10/11/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08063 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 7:54 PM
Adversary case 18-08063 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against V-Tech Indusries, L.P.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |