META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Hurley International LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08067 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 17, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Hurley International LLC
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 12/17 4:12 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 12/17 2:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 12/17 4:19 PM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Hurley International LLC CASE DISMISSED on 12/17/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/17 4:20 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Hurley International LLC CASE DISMISSED on 12/17/18 . (nmw) |
||
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 8:20 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 9:56 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on Hurley International LLC 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:24 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Hurley International LLC Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/18 8:37 AM
Summons Service Executed on Hurley International LLC 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/11 8:26 AM
Summons Issued on Hurley International LLC Date Issued 9/11/2018, Answer Due 10/11/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08067 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 8:36 PM
Adversary case 18-08067 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Hurley International LLC. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |