META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. MMS Trading Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08068 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 05, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
MMS Trading Inc.
5390 Rickenbacker Road
Bell, CA 90201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 11/05 2:04 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 11/05 1:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 11/05 2:19 PM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. MMS Trading Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 11/5/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 11/05 2:19 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. MMS Trading Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 11/5/18 . (nmw) |
||
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 8:33 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 10:12 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on MMS Trading Inc. 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
District Court re: Order Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/10 3:11 PM
Text only order was entered in Nebraska U.S. District Court Case 8:18-mc-00094-UNA granting a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for attorney Robyn B. Sokol (nmw) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:25 PM
Alias Summons Issued on MMS Trading Inc. Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/18 8:34 AM
Summons Service Executed on MMS Trading Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/11 8:27 AM
Summons Issued on MMS Trading Inc. Date Issued 9/11/2018, Answer Due 10/11/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08068 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 8:42 PM
Adversary case 18-08068 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against MMS Trading Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |