META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. EAI-JR266, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08069 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
EAI-JR266, Inc.
20100 South Vermont Avenue
Torrance, CA 90502 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/25 2:07 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (drs) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/25 10:32 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
16 | 16
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Thu 04/25 10:10 AM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
15 | 15
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Thu 04/25 10:01 AM
Order Regarding Stipulation . Pursuant to the terms of the Stipulation at Filing #13, the Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment (Fil. #9) and the Default Judgment (Fil. #10) are hereby vacated and set aside. In the stipulation, the parties have advised the court that the parties have fully and finally resolved their dispute. The parties shall file a pleading by May 9, 2019 which establishes that this matter is settled or move for dismissal, and comply with Neb. R. Bankr. P. 9013-1, if applicable. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (drs) |
|
14 | 14
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Thu 04/25 8:55 AM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/25 8:39 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and EAI-JR286, Inc. Re: Stipulation to Vacate March 7, 2019 Default Judgment Filed by Douglas L. Lutz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
utility
Reopen AP Case
Thu 04/25 8:03 AM
Adversary Case Reopened. Plaintiff's attorney advised they will be filing a Stipulation to vacate the Default Judgment. (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/25 4:11 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. EAI-JR286, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 4/25/19 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/25 11:09 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. EAI-JR286, Inc. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered on 3/5/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
court
Entry
Wed 03/20 3:16 PM
US District Court case number is 8:19-mc-00091-UNA. . (nmw) |
|
11 | 11
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Wed 03/20 1:01 PM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Default Judgment
Tue 03/05 7:26 AM
Default Judgment . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant: (i) in the amount of $129,384.00, which amount includes filing fees of $350.00; and (ii) pursuant to sections 502(d) and (j) of the Bankruptcy Code, disallowing in full and expunging all claims held by or filed on behalf of the Defendant against any of the Debtors in the above-captioned cases. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
9 | 9
order
Default Judgment
Tue 03/05 7:24 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion for default judgment is granted. Separate default judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 11:09 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 11:17 AM
Summons Service Executed on EAI-JR286, Inc. 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 1:21 PM
PLURIES Summons Issued on EAI-JR286, Inc. Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 TO REFLECT CORRECT DEFENDANTS NAME AS REFLECTED ON THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. (nmw) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 09/19 1:10 PM
Amended Complaint by Douglas L. Lutz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against EAI-JR266, Inc.. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
4 | 4
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:25 PM
Alias Summons Issued on EAI-JR266, Inc. Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/11 8:28 AM
Summons Issued on EAI-JR266, Inc. Date Issued 9/11/2018, Answer Due 10/11/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08069 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 8:49 PM
Adversary case 18-08069 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against EAI-JR266, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |