META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Ins & Outs Pottery, Inc. d/b/a Urban Trends Colle
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08074 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 16, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ins & Outs Pottery, Inc. d/b/a Urban Trends Collection
2652 E. 45th Street
Vernon, CA 90058 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 09/16 8:12 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Ins & Outs Pottery, Inc. d/b/a Urban Trends Collection CASE DISMISSED on 9/13/19 . (nmw) |
||
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Fri 09/13 4:51 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation at filing #10 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/13 3:12 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Ins and Outs Pottery, Inc. d/b/a Urban Trends Collection Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:32 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/06 1:27 PM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 Filed by Defendant Ins & Outs Pottery, Inc. d/b/a Urban Trends Collection (Carothers, Patrick) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 8:38 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 9:58 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on Ins & Outs Pottery, Inc. d/b/a Urban Trends Collection 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 12:28 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Ins & Outs Pottery, Inc. d/b/a Urban Trends Collection Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/18 4:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ins & Outs Pottery, Inc. d/b/a Urban Trends Collection 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/11 8:37 AM
Summons Issued on Ins & Outs Pottery, Inc. d/b/a Urban Trends Collection Date Issued 9/11/2018, Answer Due 10/11/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 09/10 10:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08074 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7653042, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/10 9:22 PM
Adversary case 18-08074 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Ins & Outs Pottery, Inc. d/b/a Urban Trends Collection. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |