META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Vertex Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08083 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Vertex Inc.
25528 Network Place
Chicago, IL 60673 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Thu 01/09 12:37 PM
Order to Dismiss Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation at filing14 , this adversary case is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 01/09 2:13 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Vertex Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 1/9/2020 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/08 12:36 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Vertex Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
13 | 13
court
Deficiency Notice
Wed 01/08 12:36 PM
Deficiency Notice. Deficiency must be cured by 1/22/20 . (nmw) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/08 12:25 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Vertex Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Webb, A.J.) DEFICIENT SIGNATURE. Modified on 1/8/2020 (nmw) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/19 7:16 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Vertex Inc. Re: Notice of Joint Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Vacating Order
Mon 04/22 8:46 AM
Order Vacating Order . The Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment at filing #6 and the Default Judgment at filing #7 are hereby vacated and set aside pursuant to the terms of the Stipulation at Filing #8. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
9 | 9
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Mon 04/22 8:43 AM
Order APPROVING . The Stipulation is approved and is binding on the parties. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/19 2:10 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Vertex Inc. Re: Stipulation to Vacate March 21, 2019 Default Judgment Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Default Judgment
Thu 03/21 3:52 PM
Default Judgment . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant: (i) in the amount of $113,950.00, which amount includes filing fees of $350.00; and (ii) pursuant to sections 502(d) and (j) of the Bankruptcy Code, disallowing in full and expunging all claims held by or filed on behalf of the Defendant against any of the Debtors in the above-captioned cases, including the Claim. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
6 | 6
order
Default Judgment
Thu 03/21 3:51 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion for default judgment is granted. Separate default judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 03/20 3:24 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 09/19 10:30 AM
Summons Service Executed on Vertex Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 09/12 8:15 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08083 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7654824, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/11 11:27 AM
Summons Issued on Vertex Inc. Date Issued 9/11/2018, Answer Due 10/11/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/11 11:17 AM
Adversary case 18-08083 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Vertex Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |