META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Too Good Gourmet, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08087 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 25, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Too Good Gourmet, Inc.
2380 Grant Ave.
San Lorenzo, CA 94580 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
Non-Compliance
Fri 03/29 1:21 PM
Notice of Non-Compliance . (jea) |
|
12 | 12
court
Notice of Filing in a Closed Case
Fri 03/29 1:20 PM
Notice of Filing in a Closed Case . The document related to this notice has been filed in a closed case. YOU ARE NOTIFIED by the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court that no action will be taken regarding this matter, unless a Motion to Reopen Case and the appropriate filing fee are received by this court. This document is considered administratively stricken from the record. (Text Only Entry) (jea) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Vacate
Thu 03/28 3:36 PM
Motion to Vacate Judgment Filed by Defendant Too Good Gourmet, Inc. (Shanks, Josiah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Articles of Incorporation | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Service and Summons | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jennifer Finley | ||
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
Entry
Mon 03/25 10:35 AM
US District Court case number is 8:19-mc-00098-UNA. . (nmw) |
|
9 | 9
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Mon 03/25 9:19 AM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/25 11:12 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Too Good Gourmet, Inc. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered on 3/7/19 . (nmw) |
||
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Default Judgment
Thu 03/07 11:43 AM
Default Judgment . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant: (i) in the amount of $102,961.00, which amount includes filing fees of $350.00; and (ii) pursuant to sections 502(d) and (j) of the Bankruptcy Code, disallowing in full and expunging all claims held by or filed on behalf of the Defendant against any of the Debtors in the above-captioned cases. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
7 | 7
order
Default Judgment
Thu 03/07 11:41 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion for default judgment is granted. Separate default judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 03/06 3:02 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/18 5:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Olivia Snider on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Snider, Olivia) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 09/19 10:21 AM
Summons Service Executed on Too Good Gourmet, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 09/12 8:15 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08087 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7654824, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/11 12:19 PM
Summons Issued on Too Good Gourmet, Inc. Date Issued 9/11/2018, Answer Due 10/11/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/11 11:45 AM
Adversary case 18-08087 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Too Good Gourmet, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |