META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Selligent, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08088 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Selligent, Inc.
1300 Island Dr., Suite 200
Redwood City, CA 94065 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 10/12 1:44 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 10/12 1:12 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 10/12 2:47 PM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Selligent, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 10/12/18. (cde) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 10/12 2:49 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Selligent, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 10/12/18. . (cde) |
||
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 09/19 10:39 AM
Summons Service Executed on Selligent, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 09/12 8:15 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08088 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7654824, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/11 12:25 PM
Summons Issued on Selligent, Inc. Date Issued 9/11/2018, Answer Due 10/11/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/11 11:54 AM
Adversary case 18-08088 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Selligent, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |