META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Spirit Leather Works
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08092 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 01, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Spirit Leather Works
100 Cap Court
Eugene, OR 97402 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Mon 07/01 2:55 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties at filing #10 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/01 11:44 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Spirit Leather Works Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 07/01 3:52 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Spirit Leather Works CASE DISMISSED on 7/1/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:42 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Corrective Entry
Mon 01/07 10:33 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: THE PROOF OF CLAIM (#1) WAS FILED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. THIS CLAIM SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA. (jea) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/31 9:35 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Spirit Leather Works (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/31 9:34 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Aaron F. Smeall on behalf of Spirit Leather Works. (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 8:54 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 09/19 10:41 AM
Summons Service Executed on Spirit Leather Works 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 09/12 8:15 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08092 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7654824, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/11 12:30 PM
Summons Issued on Spirit Leather Works Date Issued 9/11/2018, Answer Due 10/11/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/11 12:28 PM
Adversary case 18-08092 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Spirit Leather Works. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |