Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:18-cv-02251
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseRestrictions on Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2018
Terminated:Jan 07, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2019 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD
Represented By
Charles Wachter
Holland & Knight, Llp - Tampa
contact info
Plaintiff
Chad Fernandez
Represented By
Ruben Conitzer
Carey Rodriguez Milian Gonya LLP
contact info
David P. Milian
Carey Rodriguez Milian Gonya LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2021 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 07, 2019
28 28 order *Order pdf Mon 01/07 4:39 PM
ORDER consolidating this action with Case No. 8:18-cv-1187-EAK-AEP. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 1/7/2019. (RLH) (RLH)
Related: [-]
utility Create case association Tue 01/08 10:27 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 8:18-cv-01187-EAK-AEP. (LNR)
Related: [-]
utility Remark no number Tue 01/08 10:35 AM
Remark: All future filings will be entered on the docket sheet for case 8:18-cv-1187-T-17MAP only and will be filed in that case file. (LNR)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 04, 2019
27 27 misc Response to order to show cause Fri 01/04 3:31 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re23 Order to show cause filed by Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD. (Wachter, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/17 3:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's response to 22 Plaintiff's motion to certify class due on or before 1/4/2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 12/17/2018. (RLH)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/17 10:55 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION to Certify Class by Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD. (Wachter, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 14, 2018
24 24 order Case management and scheduling order Fri 12/14 5:07 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 3/29/2019; Discovery due by 2/19/2020; Dispositive motions due by 3/25/2020; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/18/2019; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/17/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Trial set for term commencing 9/8/2020 before Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich. The parties anticipate a JURY TRIAL will take 10 days to complete. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/27/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 12/14/2018. (SRC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
23 23 3 pgs order Order to show cause Thu 12/13 6:30 PM
ORDER to show cause as to Chad Fernandez, Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD. The parties are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing on or before January 4, 2019, why the instant action should not be consolidated with Thomas v. Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LLC, No. 8:18-cv-1187-EAK-AEP, (M.D. Fla.) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). See Order for details. The Clerk is directed to promptly docket in 8:18-cv-1187-EAK-AEP notice of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 12/13/2018. (RLH)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 07, 2018
22 22 motion Certify Class Fri 12/07 5:11 PM
MOTION to Certify Class by Chad Fernandez.(Milian, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Chad Fernandez's Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit David Milian's Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ruben Conitzer's Declaration
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
21 21 answer Answer to amended complaint Tue 12/04 3:52 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 18 Amended Complaint by Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD.(Wachter, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 30, 2018
20 20 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/03 12:05 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich. New case number: 8:18-cv-2251-T-17SPF. Judge Mary S. Scriven no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order reassigning case to another judge w/in division Fri 11/30 1:21 PM
ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/30/2018. (DKC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/20 4:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD with Jury Demand. filed by Chad Fernandez.(Milian, David)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs order Order on motion to dismiss Tue 11/20 3:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint consistent with the Court's ruling. Defendant shall have fourteen (14) days thereafter to file its Answer to the Amended Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/20/2018. (DKC)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Case Management Report Tue 11/20 2:34 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Milian, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically Fri 11/16 5:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may conduct their case management conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 11/16/2018. (NCR)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear telephonically Fri 11/16 2:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Report Conference by Chad Fernandez.(Milian, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion
Thursday, November 08, 2018
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 11/08 2:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Chad Fernandez. (Milian, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
12 12 motion Dismiss Thu 10/25 4:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD. (Wachter, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2018
11 11 order Order on motion for extension of time to answer Fri 10/05 6:17 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including October 25, 2018 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/5/2018. (DKC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 04, 2018
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 10/04 4:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD. (Wachter, Charles) Modified text on 10/4/2018 (LNR)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Thu 10/04 1:45 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD. Related case(s): yes (Wachter, Charles)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Thu 10/04 1:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested persons order by Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD. (Wachter, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 21, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of appearance Fri 09/21 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Wachter on behalf of Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD (Wachter, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Tue 09/18 4:40 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Chad Fernandez. Related case(s): yes (Milian, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Tue 09/18 4:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested persons order by Chad Fernandez. (Milian, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 13, 2018
4 4 order Interested persons order Thu 09/13 8:51 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/13/2018. (KTT)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Related case order and track 2 notice Thu 09/13 8:51 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/13/2018. (KTT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
2 2 service Summons issued Tue 09/11 3:26 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD. (LNR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/11 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Tampa Bay Rays Baseball LTD with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA52991) filed by Chad Fernandez.(LNR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet