Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-32154

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Beth A Buchanan
Case #: 3:18-ap-03040
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2018
Terminated:Jul 12, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Douglas Pund, Jr
2580 Hingham Lane
Dayton, OH 45459
Represented By
Douglas Pund, Jr
contact info
Plaintiff
Carter-Jones Lumber Company
1559 Corporate Woods Pkwy Suite 250
Uniontown, OH 44685
Represented By
Joseph R Spoonster
Harpst Ross & Becker Co., LLC
contact info
Nicholas Horrigan
Harpst Ross & Becker Co., LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, July 12, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/12 4:32 PM
Adversary Case 3:18-ap-3040 Closed (3cs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
32 32 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Fri 05/31 1:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/30/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)31 Order (Generic)
Friday, May 24, 2019
31 31 7 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 05/28 2:21 PM
Agreed Stipulation, Order, and Judgment for Nondischargeability of Debt Re: Related [+]. (3cw)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, May 23, 2019
30 30 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Fri 05/24 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)29 Agreed Order to Extend Time
Monday, May 20, 2019
29 29 order Agreed Order to Extend Time Tue 05/21 11:54 AM
Agreed Order Setting Deadline for Debtor to Respond to the Carter-Jones Lumber Company First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Request for Production of Documents. (3cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
28 28 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Fri 05/03 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/02/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)27 Order to File
Monday, April 29, 2019
27 27 order File Tue 04/30 2:32 PM
Agreed Order Setting Deadline for Debtor to Respond to the Carter-Jones Lumber Company First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Request for Production of Documents. Responses Due: 5/17/2019. (3cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 04/05 10:20 AM
Status conference set for March 19, 2019 at 1:45 p.m. was conducted by Judge Beth A. Buchanan (see Docs. 9,10 and 19). Joseph R. Spoonster, Esq. appeared telephonically as attorney for Plaintiff Carter-Jones Lumber Company; Denis E. Blasius, Esq. appeared as attorney for Defendant-Debtor Douglas Pund, Jr. Related [+] (1gb)
Related: [-] 9 Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Carter-Jones Lumber Company
Sunday, March 31, 2019
26 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Mon 04/01 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)24 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Saturday, March 30, 2019
25 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sun 03/31 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/30/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)23 Scheduling Order
Friday, March 29, 2019
24 24 order Extend/Shorten Time Fri 03/29 2:17 PM
Agreed Order Resolving Debtor's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Request of the Carter-Jones Lumber Company and Objection of the Carter-Jones Lumber Company Related [+] Deadline May 1, 2019 (3mc)
Related: [-] 21
court Hearing Canceled Fri 03/29 3:04 PM
Hearing canceled due to: By the terms of the Agreed Order24 , the April 16, 2019 hearing on the Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs First Set of Discovery Requests21 , and Plaintiff The Carter-Jones Lumber Companys Response22 is hereby cancelled. (1ac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
23 23 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/28 2:01 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Exhibit and Witness List due by 4/9/2019. Hearing set for 4/16/2019 at 02:00 PM Judge Buchanan Courtroom East (3cw)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
22 22 answer Response Tue 03/26 2:58 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Carter-Jones Lumber Company (Horrigan, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests filed by Defendant Douglas Pund
21 21 motion Extend/Shorten Time Tue 03/26 12:30 PM
Motion to Extend/Shorten Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests Filed by Defendant Douglas Pund Jr (Blasius, Denis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
20 20 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sat 03/02 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)19 Order Continuing Hearing (Adv Other)
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
19 19 order Continuing Hearing (Adv Other) Wed 02/27 12:46 PM
Order Adjourning Status Conference Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 3/19/2019 at 01:45 PM Judge Buchanan Courtroom East (3cw)
Related: [-] 9 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carter-Jones Lumber Company
Monday, February 25, 2019
court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 02/25 12:25 PM
Telephonic status conference set for February 19, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. was conducted by Judge Buchanan (see Docs. 9,10 and 17). Joseph R. Spoonster, Esq. appeared as attorney for Plaintiff Carter-Jones Lumber Company; Denis E. Blasius, Esq. appeared as attorney for Defendant-Debtor Douglas Pund, Jr. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court orally adjourned this status conference to March 19, 2019 at 1:45 p.m. Related [+] (1gb)
Related: [-] 9 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carter-Jones Lumber Company
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
18 18 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Thu 02/07 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)17 Order to Set Hearing
Friday, February 01, 2019
17 17 order Set Hearing Mon 02/04 1:39 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 2/19/2019 at 01:00 PM Judge Buchanan Telephone (3cw)
Related: [-] 9 Amended Complaint
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
16 16 misc Pretrial Statement Tue 01/22 6:52 PM
Pretrial Statement Filed by Defendant Douglas Pund Jr Related [+]. (Blasius, Denis)
Related: [-] 9 Amended Complaint
Monday, January 14, 2019
15 15 misc Pretrial Statement Mon 01/14 12:24 PM
Pretrial Statement of The Carter-Jones Lumber Company Filed by Plaintiff Carter-Jones Lumber Company Related [+]. (Horrigan, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
14 14 misc Report to Court Wed 01/02 4:51 PM
Agreed Report to Court: RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PARTIES Filed by Plaintiff Carter-Jones Lumber Company. (Horrigan, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
13 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sat 12/22 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 12/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)12 Order Governing Pretrial
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
12 12 order Governing Pretrial Wed 12/19 8:18 AM
Order Governing Pretrial and Trial Procedures In Adversary Proceedings (or Prehearing and Hearing Procedures in Certain Contested Matters) and Ordering Preliminary Pretrial Statement. Each Party Shall File a Preliminary Pretrial Statement No Later than 01/22/2019 . (3cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/17 5:36 PM
Certificate of Service Amended Filed by Defendant Douglas Pund Jr Related [+]. (Blasius, Denis)
Related: [-] 10 Answer to Complaint
Friday, December 14, 2018
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/14 5:49 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Douglas Pund Jr. (Blasius, Denis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/12 10:25 AM
Amended Complaint to Except Certain Debts from Discharge Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 523 by Nicholas Horrigan on behalf of Carter-Jones Lumber Company against Douglas Pund Jr. Related [+]. (Horrigan, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 3:18-ap-03040. (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint by Carter-Jones Lumber Company against Douglas Pund Jr. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K # 12 Exhibit L # 13 Exhibit M # 14 Exhibit N) filed by Plaintiff Carter-Jones Lumber Company
Wednesday, November 21, 2018
8 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Thu 11/22 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)7 Order (Generic)
Friday, November 16, 2018
7 7 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 11/19 8:44 AM
Agreed Order granting Debtor Douglas Pund Jr. an Extension of Time up to and including November 30, 2018 to Answer Complaint of the Carter-Jones Lumber Company (3cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 12, 2018
6 6 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sat 10/13 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)5 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
5 5 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 10/10 11:31 AM
Agreed Order granting Debtor Douglas Pund Jr. an Extension of Time up to and including November 16, 2018 to Answer Complaint of the Carter-Jones Lumber Company. (3cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 17, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 09/17 11:36 AM
Summons Service Executed on Douglas Pund Jr 9/14/2018 (Horrigan, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2018
3 3 misc Summons Issued Fri 09/14 11:46 AM
Summons Issued on Douglas Pund Jr Date Issued 9/14/2018, Answer Due 10/15/2018 (Horrigan, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Summons Issued Fri 09/14 11:35 AM
Summons Issued on Douglas Pund Jr Date Issued 9/14/2018, Answer Due 10/15/2018 (Horrigan, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/11 2:48 PM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-03040. (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint by Carter-Jones Lumber Company against Douglas Pund Jr. Fee Amount $350 (Horrigan, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Att: 12 Exhibit L
Att: 13 Exhibit M
Att: 14 Exhibit N