META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Ms. Bubbles Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08098 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ms. Bubbles Inc.
2731 S Alameda St.
Los Angeles, CA 95058 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 10/11 7:28 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 10/11 8:10 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Ms. Bubbles Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 10/11/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 10/11 8:11 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Ms. Bubbles Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 10/11/18 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/10 9:13 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 10:26 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 09/21 12:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ms. Bubbles Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/13 9:06 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08098 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7656414, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 09/12 8:56 AM
Summons Issued on Ms. Bubbles Inc. Date Issued 9/12/2018, Answer Due 10/12/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/12 8:52 AM
Adversary case 18-08098 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Ms. Bubbles Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |