META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. JS China Sourcing Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08100 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
JS China Sourcing Inc.
241 W 37th Street, Suite 924
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/25 9:22 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary ProceedingFiled by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/25 9:33 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. JS China Sourcing Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 4/25/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/24 3:33 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Snider, Olivia) |
|
6 | 6
order
Show Cause
Wed 04/24 2:24 PM
Order to Show Cause for Failure of Plaintiff to Move for Relief Show Cause due by 5/15/2019. (nmw) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/18 5:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Olivia Snider on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Snider, Olivia) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 09/21 10:35 AM
Summons Service Executed on JS China Sourcing Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/13 9:06 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08100 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7656414, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 09/12 9:20 AM
Summons Issued on JS China Sourcing Inc. Date Issued 9/12/2018, Answer Due 10/12/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/12 9:17 AM
Adversary case 18-08100 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against JS China Sourcing Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |