META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Masterpieces Puzzle Company Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08102 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 21, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Masterpieces Puzzle Company Inc.
12475 N Rancho Vistoso Blvd.
Oro Valley, AZ 86755 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 05/21 8:50 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Masterpieces Puzzle Company Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 5/20/19 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Mon 05/20 2:23 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation at filing #8 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving ntoice to parties in itnerest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Mon 05/20 10:44 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Masterpieces Puzzle Company Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Show Cause
Wed 05/08 1:11 PM
Order to Show Cause for Failure of Plaintiff to Move for Relief Show Cause due by 5/29/2019. (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 12/04 4:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sarah J Applegate on behalf of Masterpieces Puzzle Company Inc.. (Applegate, Sarah) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 9:03 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 09/21 12:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on Masterpieces Puzzle Company Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/13 9:06 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08102 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7656414, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 09/12 9:34 AM
Summons Issued on Masterpieces Puzzle Company Inc. Date Issued 9/12/2018, Answer Due 10/12/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/12 9:25 AM
Adversary case 18-08102 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Masterpieces Puzzle Company Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |