META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Carpenter Co.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08104 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Carpenter Co.
5916 Monument Ave.
Richmond, VA 23230 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 12/13 10:26 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary ProceedingFiled by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 12/13 10:06 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 12/13 10:37 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Carpenter Co. CASE DISMISSED on 12/13/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 12/13 10:38 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Carpenter Co. CASE DISMISSED on 12/13/18 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 09/19 10:48 AM
Summons Service Executed on Carpenter Co. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/13 9:06 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08104 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7656414, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 09/12 10:28 AM
Summons Issued on Carpenter Co. Date Issued 9/12/2018, Answer Due 10/12/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/12 10:21 AM
Adversary case 18-08104 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Carpenter Co.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |