Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas L Ludington
Referred: Patricia T Morris
Case #: 1:18-cv-12835
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2018
Re-opened:Sep 30, 2020
Terminated:Nov 02, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2019 5:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Walbro LLC
Represented By
Brian Shekell
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
David Cessante
Clark Hill
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth James Lowe
Represented By
Thomas R. Warnicke
Law Offices Of Thomas R. Warnicke, PLLC
contact info

GPO Oct 29 2019
ORDER Granting 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
GPO Aug 08 2022
Opinion and Order Directing Plaintiff to Show Cause and Staying Case Sua Sponte. (Show Cause Response due by 8/22/2022. Case Stayed Until 9/7/2022. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
GPO Sep 14 2023
OPINION and ORDER Granting in Part and denying in Part Defendant's 57 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
GPO Oct 05 2023
OPINION and ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 82 Motion to Compel Supplemental Discovery and Directing Defendant to Supplement its Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Request. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
GPO Oct 12 2023
OPINION and ORDER Denying in Part and Taking Under Advisement in Part Defendant's 94 Motion to Limit Plaintiff's Alleged Back Pay and Bar Front Pay Damages. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
GPO Oct 22 2024
OPINION and ORDER (1) Granting Defendant's 125 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or for a New Trial, (2) Vacating October 2023 Judgment, (3) Entering Judgment for Defendant, (4) Conditionally Granting a New Trial, (5) Denying as Moot Defendant's 126 Motion to Amend Judgment and Plaintiff's 122 Motion for Attorney Fees, and (6) Denying as Moot Defendant's 138 Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
151 151 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 01/08 10:32 AM
ORDER Granting149 Stay of Execution of148 Bill of Costs Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
150 150 respm Response to Motion Thu 01/02 2:19 PM
RESPONSE to149 MOTION to Stay Execution Pending Appeal filed by Walbro LLC. (Cessante, David)
Related: [-]