City of Palmetto v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46055 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 8:18-cv-02036 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:35 PM EST |
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Mallinckrodt
|
|
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
mallinckrodt
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Palmetto
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:36 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX028725) filed by City of Palmetto.(AEJ) [Transferred from flmd on 9/12/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/31/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/17/2018. (BGS) [Transferred from flmd on 9/12/2018.] | |
3 | 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/31/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/17/2018. (BGS) [Transferred from flmd on 9/12/2018.] | |
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Norther District of Ohio MDL case number: 2804. (AG) [Transferred from flmd on 9/12/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Middle. Case number 8:18-cv-02036. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |