Caruso v. Pacificorp
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50290 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Pacificorp
825 NE Multnomah, Suite 2000
Portland, OR 97232 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Mon 11/26 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 290768. (MD) |
||
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 11/16 11:58 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50290] Closed. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Wed 11/07 2:45 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Elizabeth N. Hahn on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Hahn, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 09/19 4:11 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Pacificorp d/b/a Rocky Mountain Power . (Hahn, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Thu 09/13 9:57 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 09/27/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 10/15/2018. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Appearance
Wed 09/12 2:01 PM
Appearance filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Wed 09/12 1:59 PM
Appearance filed by Elizabeth N. Hahn on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Hahn, Elizabeth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/12 1:58 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50290 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) Pacificorp (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Hahn, Elizabeth) |