Caruso v. Nexstar Media Group, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50304 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Nexstar Media Group, Inc.
434 East John Carpenter Freeway Suite 700
Irving, TX 75062 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John/Jane Does
135 N. Pennsylvania Street Suite 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Mon 04/29 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 291529. (TW) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/17 3:30 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50304] Closed. (lak) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Mon 04/08 12:52 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Thu 09/20 4:28 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Nexstar Media Group, Inc. f/k/a Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc. d/b/a WTVW, WYCW, WATE, WTTA, WFXR, WVBT, WAVY, WNCN, WZDX, WYCW . (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Thu 09/13 11:58 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 09/27/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 10/15/2018. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Wed 09/12 4:14 PM
Appearance filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/12 4:12 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50304 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) Nexstar Media Group, Inc., John/Jane Does (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |