META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Concepts in Time, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08110 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Concepts in Time, LLC
45 W. 36th Street 4th Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/15 2:34 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC, on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/15 8:05 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 01/15 3:25 PM
Disposition of Adversary 18-8110 META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v Concepts in Time, LLC CASE DISMISSED on 1/15/19 . (cde) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/15 3:26 PM
Adversary Case Closed 18-8110 META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v Concepts in Time, LLC CASE DISMISSED on 1/15/19 . (cde) |
||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 10:54 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 09/19 11:00 AM
Summons Service Executed on Concepts in Time, LLC 9/19/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/13 9:07 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08110 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7656414, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 09/12 2:38 PM
Summons Issued on Concepts in Time, LLC Date Issued 9/12/2018, Answer Due 10/12/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/12 2:15 PM
Adversary case 18-08110 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Concepts in Time, LLC. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |