META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Pet Edge Dealer Services, A Division of PetEdge, I
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08120 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Pet Edge Dealer Services, A Division of PetEdge, Inc.
100 Cummings Center Suite 307B
Beverly, MA 01915 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
Entry
Tue 03/19 2:09 PM
US District Court case number is 8:19-mc-00083-UNA. . (nmw) |
|
9 | 9
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Tue 03/19 12:58 PM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 03/19 2:20 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Pet Edge Dealer Services, A Division of Pet Edge, Inc. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered on 3/4/19 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 2:20 PM
Default Judgment . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant: (i) in the amount of $71,801.00, which amount includes filing fees of $350.00; and (ii) pursuant to sections 502(d) and (j) of the Bankruptcy Code, disallowing in full and expunging all claims held by or filed on behalf of the Defendant against any of the Debtors in the above-captioned cases. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
7 | 7
order
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 2:19 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion for default judgment is granted. Separate default judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 11:42 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 11:08 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 09/21 1:25 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pet Edge Dealer Services, A Division of PetEdge, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/13 9:07 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08120 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7656414, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 09/12 3:18 PM
Summons Issued on Pet Edge Dealer Services, A Division of PetEdge, Inc. Date Issued 9/12/2018, Answer Due 10/12/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/12 3:11 PM
Adversary case 18-08120 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Pet Edge Dealer Services, A Division of PetEdge, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A |