META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Enchante Accessories Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08136 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Enchante Accessories Inc.
16 East 34th Street 16th Fl.
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 01/31 1:54 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary ProceedingFiled by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 01/31 9:59 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Severini, Erin) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 01/31 3:49 PM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Enchante Accessories Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 1/31/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 01/31 3:49 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Enchante Accessories Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 1/31/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 09/26 9:26 AM
Summons Service Executed on Enchante Accessories Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/13 4:37 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08136 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7657546, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/13 8:38 AM
Summons Issued on Enchante Accessories Inc. Date Issued 9/13/2018, Answer Due 10/13/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 8:32 AM
Adversary case 18-08136 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Enchante Accessories Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |