META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Boud
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08153 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Boudreaux Operating Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine
100 Four Paws Lane
Maumelle, AR 72113 |
Represented By
BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Boudreaux Operating Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine
contact info |
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Tue 02/19 12:38 PM
Order to Dismiss Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation at Fil.9 , this adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 02/19 1:09 PM
Disposition of Adversary Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Boudreaux Operating Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine CASE DISMISSED on 2/19/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 02/19 1:11 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Boudreaux Operating Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine CASE DISMISSED on 2/19/19 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, February 18, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/18 9:41 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Boudreaux Operating Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:42 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Fri 12/14 4:07 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudias Canine Cuisine Boudreaux Operating Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Claudias Canine Cuisine Re: Extending Time to Resond to Complaint Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 12/14 4:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/17 11:50 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Patrick Patino on behalf of BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Boudreaux Operating Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine. (Patino, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 09/26 8:12 AM
Summons Service Executed on BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Boudreaux Operating Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/13 4:37 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08153 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7657546, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/13 12:14 PM
Summons Issued on BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Boudreaux Operating Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Date Issued 9/13/2018, Answer Due 10/13/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 12:04 PM
Adversary case 18-08153 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against BCCH, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine Boudreaux Operating Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Claudia's Canine Cuisine. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |