META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. GR Research Consulting LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08154 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
GR Research Consulting LLC
1480 Techny Road
Northbrook, IL 60062 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Mon 08/12 3:13 PM
Order to Dismiss Adversary Case . Pursuant to Joint Stipulation at Fil. #11 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Mon 08/12 12:05 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and GR Research Consulting, LLC Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 08/12 3:32 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. GR Research Consulting LLC CASE DISMISSED on 8/12/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:42 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
District Court re: Order Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/19 9:20 AM
Text only order was entered in Nebraska U.S. District Court Case 8:18-mc-00094-UNA granting a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for attorney Roland G. Jones (nmw) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Mon 11/19 3:31 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Adam R. Tripp on behalf of GR Research Consulting LLC. (Tripp, Adam) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 11/19 3:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Adam R. Tripp on behalf of GR Research Consulting LLC. (Tripp, Adam) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 11/09 12:56 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Defendant GR Research Consulting LLC (Tripp, Adam) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 9:41 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 09/26 8:09 AM
Summons Service Executed on GR Research Consulting LLC 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/13 4:37 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08154 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7657546, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/13 12:15 PM
Summons Issued on GR Research Consulting LLC Date Issued 9/13/2018, Answer Due 10/13/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 12:08 PM
Adversary case 18-08154 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against GR Research Consulting LLC. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |