META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Koltov Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08155 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Koltov Inc.
31250 Cedar Vakket Druve
Westlake Village, CA 91362 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 10/11 7:25 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 10/11 8:24 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Koltov Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 10/11/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 10/11 8:25 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Koltov Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 10/11/18 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/10 8:49 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 09/26 8:06 AM
Summons Service Executed on Koltov Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/13 4:37 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08155 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7657546, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/13 12:16 PM
Summons Issued on Koltov Inc. Date Issued 9/13/2018, Answer Due 10/13/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 12:12 PM
Adversary case 18-08155 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Koltov Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |