META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Hanes Underwear
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08162 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Hanes Underwear
1000 East Hanes Mill Road
Winston-Salem, NC 27105 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/29 4:13 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/29 8:52 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 01/29 4:24 PM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Hanes Underwear CASE DISMISSED on 1/29/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/29 4:25 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Hanes Underwear CASE DISMISSED on 1/29/19 . (nmw) |
||
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 9:49 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/25 4:12 PM
Summons Service Executed on Hanes Underwear 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/14 2:52 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08162 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7658797, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/13 12:54 PM
Summons Issued on Hanes Underwear Date Issued 9/13/2018, Answer Due 10/13/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 12:47 PM
Adversary case 18-08162 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Hanes Underwear. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |