Caruso v. Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50313 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.
One CNN Center
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Turner Broadcasting Sales, Inc.
One Time Warner Center
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Courtroom Television Network LLC
600 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Cartoon Network, Inc.
1050 Techwood Drive NW
Atlanta, GA 30318 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John/Jane Does
135 N. Pennsylvania Street Suite 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah J. Caruso
135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Fri 03/01 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 291248. (TW) |
||
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 02/21 3:54 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50313] Closed. (lak) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Tue 02/12 2:53 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by John C. Hoard on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso. (Hoard, John) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Tue 09/18 10:33 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Broadcasting Sales, Inc., Courtroom Television Network LLC, The Cartoon Network, Inc . (Hoard, John) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Fri 09/14 9:26 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 09/28/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 10/15/2018. (lak) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Thu 09/13 3:11 PM
Appearance filed by John C. Hoard on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso. (Hoard, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 3:09 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50313 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah J. Caruso against Defendant(s) Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Broadcasting Sales, Inc., Courtroom Television Network LLC, The Cartoon Network, Inc., John/Jane Does (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Hoard, John) |